Global Patent Index - EP 1073067 A1

EP 1073067 A1 2001-01-31 - Electrical insulated cable and its manufacturing method

Title (en)

Electrical insulated cable and its manufacturing method

Title (de)

Elektrisches isoliertes Kabel und sein Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Câble électrique isolé et procédé de fabrication d'un tel câble

Publication

EP 1073067 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402094 A

Priority

FR 9909681 A

Abstract (en)

Electrical cable comprises a central conductor coated with a semiconductor layer, an insulating layer, an aluminum conductor of several micron thickness and a flexible lead-free polyvinyl chloride (PVC) protective sheath. An Independent claim is included for the production of the cable by coating a central conductor with a ribbed semi-conductor, extruding an insulating coating, , applying an aluminum layer by anodic oxidation or phosphatization and extruding a protective sheath of PVC.

Abstract (fr)

Le câble électrique comprend un conducteur central (10) formé d'un faisceau de fils enroulés en hélice et revêtu d'une pellicule (12) de matériau semi-conducteur, une couche (14) de matériau isolant, un tube conducteur (18) en aluminium de quelques centaines de microns d'épaisseur et une gaine de protection mécanique (20). La gaine de protection est en PVC pratiquement exempt de plomb. L'aluminium est passivé en surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 9/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073067 A1 20010131; FR 2797088 A1 20010202; FR 2797088 B1 20020118

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070303

2006-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SILEC CABLE

2006-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM COMMUNICATION

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031112

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI