Global Patent Index - EP 1073076 A2

EP 1073076 A2 2001-01-31 - Signal emitter in particular a pressure or underpressure sensor

Title (en)

Signal emitter in particular a pressure or underpressure sensor

Title (de)

Signalgeber, insbesondere Druck- oder Unterdrucksensor

Title (fr)

Emetteur de signaux, en particulier un capteur de pression ou de sous-pression

Publication

EP 1073076 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113448 A

Priority

DE 19934828 A

Abstract (en)

The transducer has at least one profile element (1), especially a hollow profile element, which is made of at least two chambers (2.1,2,2). At least one chamber of the profile element(s) is at least partly in the form of a membrane (4). The profile element is an elastic, rubber-like and elongated hollow profile element.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Signalgeber, insbesondere Druck- oder Unterdrucksignalgeber zur Absicherung von Einklemmstellen, bei mechanisch betätigten Türen, Toren od. dgl. sowie für Schaltelemente, Schaltleisten, Schaltmatten od. dgl. mit zumindest einem Profilelement (1), insbesondere Hohlprofilelement, soll das zumindest eine Profilelement (1) aus wenigstens zwei Kammern (2) gebildet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01); H01H 3/24 (2006.01); H01H 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/24 (2013.01); E05F 15/47 (2013.01); E05F 2015/487 (2013.01); H01H 3/142 (2013.01); H01H 2003/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19934828 A1 20010125; EP 1073076 A2 20010131; EP 1073076 A3 20020724

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 3/24 A, 7H 01H 3/14 B, 7E 05F 15/00 B, 7F 16P 3/12 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI