Global Patent Index - EP 1073082 A2

EP 1073082 A2 2001-01-31 - Relay with rocking armature

Title (en)

Relay with rocking armature

Title (de)

Relais mit Wippanker

Title (fr)

Relais avec armature basculante

Publication

EP 1073082 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115414 A

Priority

DE 19933797 A

Abstract (en)

The carrier arms (4) have contact strip pads (5)on the underside that act as bridging contacts for fixed contacts in the relay. The carriers are moulded into a plastic center block (13) and are displaced by a pivot mounted armature. The section of the thin contact carrier is reduced to allow torsion to take place and so accommodate any inaccuracies in alignment.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Relais mit einem Sockel, einem mittig gelagerten Anker, einer Kontaktfeder, die an einem mittleren Abschnitt mit dem Anker (2) verbunden ist, so daß die Kontaktfeder (3) und der Anker (2) eine gemeinsame Lagerachse besitzen, und die an ihren freien Enden (4) Brückenkontakte (5) trägt. Das Relais ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Kontaktfeder (3) auf jeder Seite der Lagerachse einen Kontaktarm (6) bildet, der jeweils zwischen der Lagerachse und dem freien Ende (4) einen durch Verengungen gebildeten Torsionssteg (7) aufweist. Die Erfindung ist vorteilhaft, weil Höhentoleranzen der Festkontakte ausgeglichen werden können, ohne daß dadurch der Aufbau der Kontaktfeder (3) aufwendiger wird oder der Strompfad lang, so daß sich der Durchgangswiderstand erhöht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/22; H01H 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/2281 (2013.01); H01H 1/2075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073082 A2 20010131; EP 1073082 A3 20020619; DE 19933797 A1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 51/22 A, 7H 01H 1/20 B, 7H 01H 50/54 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI