Global Patent Index - EP 1073083 A2

EP 1073083 A2 2001-01-31 - Electromagnetic trip device

Title (en)

Electromagnetic trip device

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Auslöser

Title (fr)

Déclencheur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1073083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115256 A

Priority

DE 19935662 A

Abstract (en)

An electromagnetic actuator for an electrical switching device has a yoke (31), a coil (34) and an armature (35). When excited the unit opens the power carrying contacts. The end of the actuator armature has a coil spring (38) that is fixed in a groove (36) and defines a specific overload switching point.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein elektromagnetischer Auslöser für ein elektrisches Schaltgerät, insbesondere einen Motorschutzschalter, mit einem Joch (31), einer Spule (34), einem Anker (35), der bei Auftreten eines bestimmten Überstromes eine Kontaktstelle direkt und/oder über ein Schaltschloß öffnet, und mit einer Fesselfeder (38) für den Anker (35) beschrieben, der an seinem aus der Spule (34) herausragenden Ende eine umlaufende Nut (36) aufweist, in die das Ende der auf Druck belastenden Schraubenfeder (38) eingreift und den Anker (35) so bis zu einem bestimmten Wert des Überstromes fesselt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/24; H01H 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/2463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073083 A2 20010131; EP 1073083 A3 20020821; EP 1073083 B1 20030827; DE 19935662 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130714

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003423

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 71/24 A

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI