Global Patent Index - EP 1073084 A2

EP 1073084 A2 2001-01-31 - Arrangement of switch contacts for a circuit breaker

Title (en)

Arrangement of switch contacts for a circuit breaker

Title (de)

Schaltkontaktanordnung für einen Leistungsschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contact de commutation pour disjoncteur

Publication

EP 1073084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114806 A

Priority

DE 19935661 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical power switch has an actuator pin (20) that locates in a guide slot (55) and is displaced vertically to displace the contact bridge (30). The contact bridge slides in a slot in the actuator and this moves against the action of a spring (34).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schaltkontaktanordnung insbesondere für einen Leistungsschalter, mit einer Doppelkontaktstelle pro Phase, mit zwei in Abstand zueinander angeordneten, in einer Phasenleitung befindlichen feststehenden Kontaktstücken, die von einer Kontaktbrücke überbrückt werden, mit je einer Kontaktdruckfeder und mit einer Kontaktbrückenführung für jede Phase. Die Kontaktbrückenführung ist durch einen Stößel (20, 20a, 20b) gebildet, der einen Fortsatz (24) mit einem Schlitz (25) aufweist, in den die zugehörige Kontaktbrücke (30) einlegbar ist, daß der die Kontaktbrücke (30) überragende Fortsatz (24) in eine Kontaktdruckfeder (34) einfügbar ist und daß der Stößel (20, 20a, 20b) mit der Kontaktbrücke in einer Aufnahmeöffnung des Leistungsschalters einrastbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 73/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 73/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/0214 (2013.01); H01H 73/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073084 A2 20010131; EP 1073084 A3 20020814; EP 1073084 B1 20030827; DE 19935661 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130711

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003424

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 73/04 A, 7H 01H 1/20 B, 7H 01H 50/54 B

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI