Global Patent Index - EP 1073141 A2

EP 1073141 A2 2001-01-31 - Adhered glass antenna

Title (en)

Adhered glass antenna

Title (de)

Glashaftantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne adhérente sur vitre

Publication

EP 1073141 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115119 A

Priority

DE 19934867 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6424306B1] A windshield antenna including, in particular, a multirange coupler for transmitting the L band and band III for DAB reception between an antenna base and a connecting module through a pane is described. An L band amplifier and/or printed circuit boards, whose surfaces facing the pane, which are designed to be conductive, form the capacitive transmitter, and whose opposite surfaces carry connecting and/or circuit elements, are provided in the connecting module. As an alternative or in addition, integration of a slot antenna in a capacitive transmitter can also be provided.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird Glashaftantenne insbesondere mit einem Mehrbereichskoppler zur Übertragung des L-Bandes und des Bandes III für DAB-Empfang zwischen einem Antennenfuß und einem Anschlußmodul durch eine Scheibe. Erfindungsgemäß sind im Anschlußmodul ein L-Band-Verstärker und/oder Leiterplatten vorgesehen, deren der Scheibe zugewandte Flächen, die leitend ausgebildet sind, den kapazitiven Übertrager bilden, und deren gegenüberliegende Flächen Anschluß- und/oder Schaltungselemente tragen. Alternativ oder zusätzlich kann auch eine Integration einer Schlitzantenne in einen kapazitiven Übertrager vorgesehen sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 21/30; H01Q 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 21/30 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 23/00 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1285 (2013.01); H01Q 5/321 (2013.01); H01Q 21/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073141 A2 20010131; EP 1073141 A3 20030219; DE 19934867 A1 20010215; US 6424306 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051025

2003-11-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI