Global Patent Index - EP 1073143 A1

EP 1073143 A1 2001-01-31 - Dual polarisation printed antenna and corresponding array

Title (en)

Dual polarisation printed antenna and corresponding array

Title (de)

Dualpolarisierte gedruckte Antenne und entsprechende Gruppenantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne imprimée bi-polarisation et réseau d'antennes correspondant

Publication

EP 1073143 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00460045 A

Priority

FR 9910105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2314688A1] A printed bi-polarization antenna and corresponding network of antennas. The antenna can be used as a probe in a device for testing an antenna by measurement of radio wave radiation, or in the field of telecommunications, for example, in the base stations of a radio communications system, or in a multi-media satellite receiver. The antenna comprises: (a) first, second and third superimposed substrate plates; (b) a first metal deposit situated on the external face of the first substrate pla te defining at least one first radiating element of the dipole type, in the for m of a T, the horizontal bar of the T constituting two radiating lateral strands separated by a coupling slit; (c) a first power supply line pursuant to a first polarization, situated between the first and second substrate plates and supplying power to the at least one first radiating element; (d) a second metal deposit, situated on the external face of a third substrate plate and defini ng at least one second radiating element of the dipole type, in the form of a T , the horizontal bar of the T constituting two radiating lateral strands separated by a coupling slit; and (e) a second power supply line pursuant to a second polarization, situated between said second and third substrate plates and supplying power to the at least one secondradiating element. The antenna limits the dangers of parasitic couplings, has low volume, easy mechanical maintenance, an omni-directional radiation diagram and a broad band width. A corresponding network of the antennas is also described.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une antenne imprimée bi-polarisation comprenant : des première, seconde et troisième plaques de substrat (1, 2, 3) superposées ; un premier dépôt métallique (4), situé sur la face externe de ladite première plaque de substrat (1) et définissant au moins un premier élément rayonnant (5, 6) du type dipôle, en forme de T, la barre horizontale dudit T étant constituée de deux brins latéraux rayonnants séparés par une fente de couplage ; une première ligne d'alimentation (7) selon une première polarisation, située entre lesdites première et seconde plaques de substrat (1, 2) et alimentant ledit au moins un premier élément rayonnant (5, 6) ; un second dépôt métallique (8), situé sur la face externe de ladite troisième plaque de substrat (3) et définissant au moins un second élément rayonnant du type dipôle (9, 10), en forme de T, la barre horizontale dudit T étant constituée de deux brins latéraux rayonnants séparés par une fente de couplage ; une seconde ligne d'alimentation (11) selon une seconde polarisation, située entre lesdites seconde et troisième plaques de substrat (2, 3) et alimentant ledit au moins un second élément rayonnant (9, 10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 9/16 (2006.01); H01Q 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073143 A1 20010131; EP 1073143 B1 20070530; AT 363745 T 20070615; CA 2314688 A1 20010130; DE 60035003 D1 20070712; DE 60035003 T2 20080131; FR 2797098 A1 20010202; FR 2797098 B1 20070223; JP 2001085939 A 20010330; US 6281849 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140726

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60035003

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140726

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60035003

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070905

2007-09-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070910

2007-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60035003 P 20070712

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT SE

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES GB IT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI