Global Patent Index - EP 1073162 A1

EP 1073162 A1 2001-01-31 - Switch device with AC inlet

Title (en)

Switch device with AC inlet

Title (de)

Schalteranordnung mit Wechselspannungseingangsstecker

Title (fr)

Interrupteur avec prise d'entrée de tension alternative

Publication

EP 1073162 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00116032 A

Priority

JP 21053499 A

Abstract (en)

A connecting structure in a switch device with AC inlets is disclosed wherein, when terminals of the switch device are connected together using a thin metallic connecting strip, there is no fear of an external force being imposed on the terminals and causing damage to the connection between the terminals and the connecting strip, nor is there any fear of unstable contact, and which can keep a terminal holding position of the bracket stable and is superior in assemblability and reliability of connection. The switch device comprises AC inlets having a connecting pin for AC input and an inlet terminal for connection, an AC switch having a connecting-side terminal and an output-side terminal, a metallic connecting strip for electrically connecting the inlet terminal of the AC inlets and the connecting-side terminal of the AC switch with each other, and a bracket with the AC inlets and the AC switch attached thereto. The inlet terminal, which is connected with the connecting strip, is provided with a connecting piece for connection with the connecting strip and an arm portion having the connecting piece at a free end thereof, the free end of the arm portion being flexible in a rotational direction centered on the axis of the connecting pin of the AC inlets. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 27/00; H01R 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/04 (2006.01); H01H 9/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/08 (2006.01); H01R 27/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/08 (2013.01); H01R 27/00 (2013.01); H01H 1/5866 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073162 A1 20010131; EP 1073162 B1 20040602; CN 1110873 C 20030604; CN 1282125 A 20010131; DE 60011191 D1 20040708; DE 60011191 T2 20050707; JP 2001035314 A 20010209; JP 3720642 B2 20051130; US 6201197 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080726

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080726

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011191 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020430

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI