Global patent index - EP 1073172 A1

EP 1073172 A1 2001-01-31 - Supply unit

Title (en)

Supply unit

Title (de)

Versorgungseinheit

Title (fr)

Unité d'alimentation

Publication

EP 1073172 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115376 A

Priority

DE 29912484 U

Abstract (en)

The supply unit has at least one elongated channel profile (11,12) for accommodating and guiding supply lines, cables or similar and a cover plate (13,14) connected to the profile. The profile can be made up of at least two profile segments that are joined together along a joint extending along the longitudinal direction of the profile. The profile segments can be reversibly joined.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Versorgungseinheit, insbesondere zur Versorgung von Patienten im Krankenpflegebereich mit mindestens einem aus einem kanalartigen Profil zur Aufnahme und Führung von Versorgungsleitungen und einer mit dem Profil verbindbaren Abdeckplatte zum Verschließen des Kanals, derart weiterzuentwickeln, dass das Gesamtprofil entsprechend den im Einzelfall gegebenen Kundenanforderungen einfach fertig zusammensetzbar ist und die Materialstärken der Profile unter Beibehaltung der Gesamtstabilität reduzierbar sind, wird gemäß der Erfindung vorgeschlagen, das Profil in seiner Gesamtheit aus mindestens zwei Profilsegmenten entlang mindestens einer in Längserstrekkungsrichtung verlaufenden Fügestelle zusammenzusetzen und durch an der Fügestelle vorzusehende Verbindungsmittel vorzumontieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02G 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 12/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912484 U1 19990923; DE 50016096 D1 20110601; EP 1073172 A1 20010131; EP 1073172 B1 20110420; EP 1073172 B8 20110713; ES 2364235 T3 20110829

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 50016096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20120123

2011-08-29 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2364235

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Effective date: 20110829

2011-07-13 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRILUX MEDICAL GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50016096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRILUX MEDICAL GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50016096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-06-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 50016096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50016096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2011-06-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2011-05-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TRILUX MEDICAL GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2011-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2011-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-04-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRILUX GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20081015

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI