Global Patent Index - EP 1073314 A1

EP 1073314 A1 2001-01-31 - Method for fitting a hearing aid and hearing aid

Title (en)

Method for fitting a hearing aid and hearing aid

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Anpassung eines Hörhilfegerätes sowie Hörhilfegerät

Title (fr)

Procédé d'adaptation d'une prothése auditive et prothése auditive

Publication

EP 1073314 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114701 A

Priority

EP 99114701 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves detecting auditory, involuntary body signals from the wearer of the hearing aid using a measuring device connected to the wearer. An evaluation device generates starting parameters for the hearing aid based on the measured values. These parameters are transferred to the signal processing unit of the hearing aid for individual adjustments. A signal may be fed to at least one ear of the wearer of the hearing aid. The measuring device detects the involuntary body signals caused by this signal. The signal may be acoustic, electrical, electromagnetic or mechanical.

Abstract (de)

Zur Anpassung eines am Körper getragenen oder implantierten Hörhilfegerätes (3) werden einem Hörgeräteträger Stimuli zugeführt. Eine mit dem Hörgeräteträger verbundene Meßeinrichtung erfaßt durch die Stimulation evozierte Körpersignale und führt sie einer Auswerteeinheit zu, die daraus hörgerätespezifische Anpaßparameter generiert. Diese werden an die Signalverarbeitungseinheit des Hörhilfegerätes (3) zur individuellen Anpassung übertragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; H04R 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01); H04R 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/556 (2013.01); H04R 25/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073314 A1 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070613

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI