Global Patent Index - EP 1073353 A1

EP 1073353 A1 2001-02-07 - BRISTLE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID BRISTLE AND A DEVICE WITH A BRISTLE OF THIS TYPE

Title (en)

BRISTLE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID BRISTLE AND A DEVICE WITH A BRISTLE OF THIS TYPE

Title (de)

BORSTE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND GERÄT MIT EINER SOLCHEN BORSTE

Title (fr)

POIL DE BROSSERIE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET APPAREIL COMPORTANT UN TEL POIL DE BROSSERIE

Publication

EP 1073353 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923408 A

Priority

  • DE 19818345 A
  • EP 9902403 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818345A1] A profile (4) is created in a flexible elastic layer (3) by heat embossing against a harder core (2). Independent claims are included for: (a) the production of the bristle material in which the core (2) and elastic layer (3) are coextruded and the latter profiled and impressed against the core during the extrusion; (b) a process in which the coextruded core and elastic layer are wound up and the impressing is effected when the product is uncoiled; (c) individual bristles are cut to length from the coextruded product and then impressed; (d) the bristle material; and (e) a dental brush utilizing the bristles; and (f) a brush with the bristles. Preferred Features: The elastic layer forms either a complete sleeve or covers specific areas. The core plastic influences the bending and buckling resistance and the rubbery elastic layer with profiling (4) determines the visual aspect and wear resistance. Profiling may comprise local recesses (5) or may run longitudinally or transversely in the elastic layer. A film layer may cover the elastic layer. Cores may be none circular with a corresponding flexible layer and may also have a structured surface or coating to enhance bonding to the flexible layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/00 (2006.01); A46D 1/04 (2006.01); B29C 59/00 (2006.01); B29D 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/023 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A46D 1/0238 (2013.01); A46D 1/0246 (2013.01); A46D 1/0261 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2924 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2929 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2931 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818345 A1 19991028; AR 015016 A1 20010411; AU 4030299 A 19991116; AU 746808 B2 20020502; BR 9909857 A 20001219; CA 2328770 A1 19991104; CN 1115121 C 20030723; CN 1298284 A 20010606; EG 22279 A 20021231; EP 1073353 A1 20010207; EP 1073353 B1 20020612; ES 2178438 T3 20021216; JP 2002512824 A 20020508; JP 4311878 B2 20090812; PL 193087 B1 20070131; PL 343632 A1 20010827; RU 2205581 C2 20030610; US 6391445 B1 20020521; WO 9955195 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120410

2013-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130716

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120409

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120409

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120409

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110516

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PEDEX GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59901741

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110304

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178438

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901741

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT