Global Patent Index - EP 1073355 A1

EP 1073355 A1 2001-02-07 - DEFORMABLE DEVICE FOR MAINTAINING THE END OF ONE OR SEVERAL SLATS ON A BED BASE FRAME OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

DEFORMABLE DEVICE FOR MAINTAINING THE END OF ONE OR SEVERAL SLATS ON A BED BASE FRAME OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

VERFORMBARE HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE LATTENENDEN EINES LATTENROSTES ODER DERGLEICHES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DEFORMABLE DE MAINTIEN DE L'EXTREMITE D'UNE OU DE PLUSIEURS LATTES SUR LE CADRE D'UN SOMMIER OU AUTRE

Publication

EP 1073355 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99915819 A

Priority

  • FR 9900963 W
  • FR 9805454 A
  • FR 9812536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955202A1] The invention concerns a device comprising a type of clip (5) made from a high density polyethylene type material, with high elastic memory. The clip consists of a flange (6) fixed in its central part either directly, or via an elastic member, to the bed base long section. Said flange (6) comprises folds at its ends in the form of hooks (7). Said hooks extend slightly above the slat for catching the latter in the clip from above. Said clip (5) can be extended by a base (16) enabling to wedge or fit in the slat and the whole assembly can be covered with a top made from a rubber-type material, which top can have shape and colours adapted to the purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/064 (2013.01); A47C 23/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955202A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955202 A1 19991104; AU 3426399 A 19991116; DE 69903416 D1 20021114; DE 69903416 T2 20030814; EP 1073355 A1 20010207; EP 1073355 B1 20021009; ES 2182511 T3 20030301

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182511 T3

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903416 20021114

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI