Global Patent Index - EP 1073356 B1

EP 1073356 B1 2002-11-20 - SEALED SHOWCASE FOR PAINTINGS OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

SEALED SHOWCASE FOR PAINTINGS OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

ABGEDICHTETER SCHAUKASTEN FÜR GEMÄLDE ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

PRESENTOIR VITRE SCELLE POUR PEINTURES ET SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 1073356 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917047 A

Priority

  • IT 9900080 W
  • IT MI980721 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951128A1] The invention relates to a sealed showcase (1) for accommodating paintings or the like, comprising a substantially parallelepiped framework (2) adapted to accommodate a painting (3), the framework having a front side (5) intended for orientation toward an exhibition room and a backside (6) intended to lie close to a hangwall for the showcase, respectively defined therein; a rear panel (7) peripherally associated with the framework backside; a front panel (10) peripherally associated with the framework front side and including a transparent pane (13); sealing means (9), respectively located between the front panel and the framework front side, and between the rear panel and the framework backside; an abutment in the front panel for receiving a setting frame (16) of the painting. The showcase of the invention is characterized in that the front panel can be opened from the framework.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/00; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47G 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/005 (2013.01); A47G 1/06 (2013.01); A47G 2001/0661 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951128 A1 19991014; AT 227952 T 20021215; AU 3532099 A 19991025; DE 69904032 D1 20030102; DE 69904032 T2 20030724; EP 1073356 A1 20010207; EP 1073356 B1 20021120; IT 1299021 B1 20000207; IT MI980721 A1 19991004

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-09-21 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-05-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GOPPION S.P.A.

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GLASBAU HAHN GMBH + CO.KG

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904032 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227952 T 20021215

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL