Global Patent Index - EP 1073421 A1

EP 1073421 A1 2001-02-07 - STABILIZED PROTEIN CRYSTALS, FORMULATIONS CONTAINING THEM AND METHODS OF MAKING THEM

Title (en)

STABILIZED PROTEIN CRYSTALS, FORMULATIONS CONTAINING THEM AND METHODS OF MAKING THEM

Title (de)

STABILISIERTE PROTEIN-KRISTALLE, DIESE ENTHALTENDE FORMULIERUNGEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

CRISTAUX DE PROTEINES STABILISEES, FORMULATIONS RENFERMANT LESDITS CRISTAUX ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1073421 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920064 A

Priority

  • US 9909099 W
  • US 8314898 P
  • US 22447598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2330476A1] This invention relates to methods for the stabilization, storage and deliver y of biologically active macromolecules, such as proteins, peptides and nuclei c acids. In particular, this invention relates to protein or nucleic acid crystals, formulations and compositions comprising them. Methods are provide d for the crystallization of proteins and nucleic acids and for the preparatio n of stabilized protein or nucleic acid crystals for use in dry or slurry formulations. The present invention is further directed to encapsulating proteins, glycoproteins, enzymes, antibodies, hormones and peptide crystals or crystal formulations into compositions for biological delivery to humans and animals.

[origin: CA2330476A1] This invention relates to methods for the stabilization, storage and delivery of biologically active macromolecules, such as proteins, peptides and nucleic acids. In particular, this invention relates to protein or nucleic acid crystals, formulations and compositions comprising them. Methods are provided for the crystallization of proteins and nucleic acids and for the preparation of stabilized protein or nucleic acid crystals for use in dry or slurry formulations. The present invention is further directed to encapsulating proteins, glycoproteins, enzymes, antibodies, hormones and peptide crystals or crystal formulations into compositions for biological delivery to humans and animals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/16; C12N 9/04; C12N 9/20; C12N 9/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/04 (2006.01); A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/19 (2006.01); A61K 9/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 38/27 (2006.01); A61K 38/44 (2006.01); A61K 38/45 (2006.01); A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 38/52 (2006.01); A61K 38/53 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/40 (2006.01); B01J 13/12 (2006.01); C12N 9/20 (2006.01); C12N 9/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/1647 (2013.01); A61K 47/10 (2013.01); A61K 47/26 (2013.01); A61K 47/40 (2013.01); A61K 47/42 (2013.01); C07K 14/765 (2013.01); C12N 9/0004 (2013.01); C12N 9/24 (2013.01); C12N 9/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955310A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 3764699 A 19991116; AU 757991 B2 20030313; CA 2330476 A1 19991104; EP 1073421 A1 20010207; JP 2002512949 A 20020508; JP 4965022 B2 20120704; SG 121739 A1 20060526

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130418

2012-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTHEA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2012-02-22 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-01-11 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20091111

2011-12-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034198

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE