Global Patent Index - EP 1073450 A1

EP 1073450 A1 2001-02-07 - PNEUMOCOCCAL SURFACE PROTEIN C(PspC), EPITOPIC REGIONS AND STRAIN SELECTION THEREOF, AND USES THEREFOR

Title (en)

PNEUMOCOCCAL SURFACE PROTEIN C(PspC), EPITOPIC REGIONS AND STRAIN SELECTION THEREOF, AND USES THEREFOR

Title (de)

PNEUMOKOKKALES OBERFLÄCHENPROTEIN C (PSPC), EPITOPISCHE REGIONEN, SELELKTION VON ENTSPRECHENDEN STÄMMEN UND VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROTEINE DE SURFACE PNEUMOCOCCIQUE C(PSPC), REGIONS EPITOPES ET SELECTION DE SOUCHES D'UNE TELLE PROTEINE, ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES

Publication

EP 1073450 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919991 A

Priority

  • US 9908895 W
  • US 8272898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953940A1] Disclosed and claimed are: epitopic regions of Pneumococcal Surface Protein C or "PspC", different clades of PspC, isolated and/or purified nucleic acid molecules such as DNA encoding a fragment or portion of PspC such as an epitopic region of PspC or at least one epitope of PspC, uses for such nucleic acid molecules, e.g., to detect the presence of PspC or of S. pneumoniae by detecting a nucleic acid molecule therefor in a sample such as by amplification and/or a polymerase chain reaction, vectors or plasmids which contain and/or express such nucleic acid molecules, e.g., in vitro or in vivo, immunological, immunogenic or vaccine compositions including at least one PspC and/or a portion thereof (such as at least one epitopic region of at least one PspC and/or at least one polypeptide encoding at least one epitope of at least one PspC), either alone or in further combination with at least one second pneumococcal antigen, such as at least one different PspC and/or a fragment thereof and/or at least one PspA and/or at least one epitopic region of at least one PspA and/or at least one polypeptide including at least one epitope of PspA. PspC or a fragment thereof, and thus a composition including PspC or a fragment thereof, can be administered by the same routes, and in approximately the same amounts, as PspA. Thus, the invention further provides methods for administering PspC or a fragment thereof, as well as uses of PspC or a fragment thereof to formulate such compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/04; A61K 38/16; A61K 39/09; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/195 (2006.01); C07K 14/315 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/3156 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/51 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953940 A1 19991028; AU 3758499 A 19991108; AU 770378 B2 20040219; CA 2328399 A1 19991028; EP 1073450 A1 20010207; EP 1073450 A4 20030423; JP 2002516251 A 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-04-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/04 A

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/16 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/09 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/315 B

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE