Global Patent Index - EP 1073460 A1

EP 1073460 A1 2001-02-07 - NUCLEIC ACID ENCODING HYALURONAN SYNTHASE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

NUCLEIC ACID ENCODING HYALURONAN SYNTHASE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

NUKLEINSÄURE KODIEREND FÜR HYALURONAN SYNTHASE UND METHODEN ZUR VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CODANT UNE HYALURONAN SYNTHASE ET SES METHODES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1073460 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917339 A

Priority

  • US 9907289 W
  • US 8041498 P
  • US 17885198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951265A1] The present invention relates to a nucleic acid segment having a coding region segment encoding enzymatically active bacterial multocida hyaluronate synthase (PmHAS), and to the use of this nucleic acid segment in the preparation of recombinant cells which produce hyaluronate synthase and its hyaluronic acid product. Hyaluronate is also known as hyaluronic acid or hyaluronan. The present invention also relates to the use of the PmHAS in constructing "knock-out" mutant strains of P. multocida for use in vaccinations. The present invention further relates to the use of the PmHAS in diagnostic tests in the field determinations of livestock P. multocida infection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/02; C12Q 1/68; C12N 1/00; C12N 1/15; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/10; C12N 15/54; C12N 15/63; C12P 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/102 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 19/04 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/689 (2013.01); A61K 39/102 (2013.01); C12N 9/1051 (2013.01); C12P 19/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951265 A1 19991014; WO 9951265 A9 20000413; AT 501275 T 20110315; AU 3548599 A 19991025; AU 770903 B2 20040304; BR 9909346 A 20010911; CA 2326821 A1 19991014; CA 2326821 C 20100928; CN 101275143 A 20081001; CN 1304317 A 20010718; CN 1327894 C 20070725; CZ 20003576 A3 20010912; DE 69943276 D1 20110421; EP 1073460 A1 20010207; EP 1073460 A4 20010523; EP 1832662 A2 20070912; EP 1832662 A3 20071107; EP 1832662 B1 20110309; IL 138803 D0 20011031; JP 2002510648 A 20020409; JP 2008283974 A 20081127; JP 4490581 B2 20100630; JP 4887333 B2 20120229

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080208

2007-11-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033552

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEANGELIS, PAUL

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIGEL PAUL H.

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUMARI, KSHAMA

2001-05-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEANGELIS, PAUL

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIGEL PAUL H.

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUMARI, KSHAMA

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEANGELIS, PAUL

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIGEL PAUL H.,

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUMARI, KSHAMA

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001027;LT PAYMENT 20001027;LV PAYMENT 20001027;MK PAYMENT 20001027;RO PAYMENT 20001027;SI PAYMENT 20001027