Global Patent Index - EP 1073468 A1

EP 1073468 A1 2001-02-07 - USE OF AN ADHESIVE COMPOSITION OVER A BIOACTIVE POLYMERIZATION INITIATOR OR ACCELERATOR

Title (en)

USE OF AN ADHESIVE COMPOSITION OVER A BIOACTIVE POLYMERIZATION INITIATOR OR ACCELERATOR

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER KLEBRIGEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM BIOAKTIVEN POLYMERISIERUNGSINITIATOR ODER-BESCHLEUNIGER

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION ADHESIVE AVEC UN INITIATEUR OU UN ACCELERATEUR BIOACTIF DE POLYMERISATION

Publication

EP 1073468 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921545 A

Priority

  • US 9909374 W
  • US 6987598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955374A1] A composition comprising a polymerizable adhesive monomer is applied over a biologically active initiator or accelerator for polymerization of the monomer. The biologically active initiator or accelerator is a medicament that provides a desired medical or therapeutic activity as well as enhancing polymerization of the adhesive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/16; A61K 9/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/70 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61L 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/32 (2013.01); A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 9/7015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955374A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955374 A1 19991104; AU 3873099 A 19991116; AU 759076 B2 20030403; BR 9910063 A 20001226; CA 2330479 A1 19991104; CN 1299289 A 20010613; EP 1073468 A1 20010207; JP 2002512980 A 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 47/16 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/70 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 17/02 B

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NARANG, UPVAN

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE