Global Patent Index - EP 1073534 A1

EP 1073534 A1 2001-02-07 - METHOD FOR HOT PRESSING WORKPIECES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR HOT PRESSING WORKPIECES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM WARMPRESSEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMPRESSION A CHAUD DE PIECES

Publication

EP 1073534 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913052 A

Priority

  • CH 9900155 W
  • CH 93498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955475A1] A device for hot pressing workpieces, comprising a matrix (5), an ejector (7) associated therewith that can move outwards and inwards and a pressure ram (1) that can move forwards and backwards. The ejector (7) is joined to a displaceable control piston (8) arranged in a pressure chamber (28). A liquid can flow out of the pressure chamber (28) via an exit hole (28) and a discharge line (23). A throttle (25) is arranged in the liquid discharge line (23) in order to retard the liquid as it flows outward and delay the extended ejector (7) as it is pushed back by the advancing pressure ram (1) in such a way that a workpiece (4) arranged between the ejector (7) and the pressure ram (1) is upset outside the matrix (5) and descaled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 5/00; B21J 1/04; B21J 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 1/04 (2006.01); B21J 5/00 (2006.01); B21J 5/08 (2006.01); B21J 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/00 (2013.01); B21J 1/04 (2013.01); B21J 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955475A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955475 A1 19991104; AU 3135399 A 19991116; CN 1089653 C 20020828; CN 1298329 A 20010606; CZ 20003924 A3 20010516; CZ 296945 B6 20060816; DE 59903173 D1 20021128; EA 002505 B1 20020627; EA 200001100 A1 20010423; EP 1073534 A1 20010207; EP 1073534 B1 20021023; ES 2182502 T3 20030301; JP 2002512888 A 20020508; JP 3524496 B2 20040510; KR 100400706 B1 20031008; TW 453913 B 20010911; US 6286350 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100420

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100419

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100419

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100419

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090508

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG#GENERAL GUISAN-STRASSE 21#CH-4153 REINACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG#GENERAL GUISAN-STRASSE 21#CH-4153 REINACH (CH)

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182502 T3

2003-01-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903173 20021128

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-11-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-05-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HOT PRESSING WORKPIECES

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL