Global Patent Index - EP 1073546 B1

EP 1073546 B1 2002-11-20 - CARRIER FOR FOOD PRODUCTS

Title (en)

CARRIER FOR FOOD PRODUCTS

Title (de)

SCHNITTGUTWAGEN

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE TRANSPORT POUR PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES

Publication

EP 1073546 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916084 A

Priority

  • NL 9900237 W
  • NL 1008994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955500A1] The invention relates to a carrier (1) for conveyance and storage of food products such as meat products in an appliance for automatically slicing the food product. The carrier (1) comprises a base plate (3) and optionally a standing wall (2) for supporting the food product during slicing. In accordance with the invention means (4, 9, 10) are present for fixing the position of the food products in relation to the carrier (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/06; B26D 7/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2013.01); B26D 7/0608 (2013.01); B26D 2007/011 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955500 A1 19991104; DE 69904034 D1 20030102; DE 69904034 T2 20031009; EP 1073546 A1 20010207; EP 1073546 B1 20021120; NL 1008994 C2 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904034 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL