Global Patent Index - EP 1073556 A1

EP 1073556 A1 2001-02-07 - RADIAL PRESS

Title (en)

RADIAL PRESS

Title (de)

RADIALPRESSE

Title (fr)

PRESSE RADIALE

Publication

EP 1073556 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914456 A

Priority

  • DE 19817882 A
  • EP 9900959 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954122A1] The invention relates to a radial press comprising two yokes (6,7) and a plurality of cheek plates. The press yokes are arranged on a plane that is perpendicular to the press axis (51). They are located diametrically opposite the press axis and can be moved towards each other in a straight line by means of a drive unit (31), whereby the direction of movement (A) is perpendicular to the press axis (51). At least one part of the cheek plates that are disposed in the press yokes (6, 7) has slide surfaces that respectively cooperate with a control surface (17, 18, 21; 22) of one of the press yokes (6, 7) or an adjacent cheek plate in such a way that all of the cheek plates can be moved in a uniform manner onto the press axis (51) when the press yokes (6, 7) move closer to each other. The drive unit comprises at least one cross slide (31) which is associated with one press yoke (7) and which can be displaced in a position that is perpendicular (B) to the direction (A) of the press yokes (6, 7) as they move towards each other, whereby the displacement of said cross slide is converted into a movement of the associated press yoke by means of a deflection device (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 7/04; B21D 39/04; B30B 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01); B30B 1/40 (2006.01); B30B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 7/04 (2013.01); B21D 39/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954122A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19861171 B4 20050922; EP 1073556 A1 20010207; EP 1073556 B1 20021016; WO 9954122 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903096 20021121

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT