Global Patent Index - EP 1073565 A1

EP 1073565 A1 2001-02-07 - INFANT'S CAR SEAT

Title (en)

INFANT'S CAR SEAT

Title (de)

KINDERSITZ FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

SIEGE AUTO POUR ENFANT

Publication

EP 1073565 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99910466 A

Priority

  • FR 9900746 W
  • FR 9805217 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777517A1] The seat is able to move along a track, limited and defined by the profile of the base (3). The base is formed as a single piece body, with the two side flanks, forming the slide profile, and with the central section forming a cavity. The seat (2) is carried by two supports (2.4,2.5), which carry runners (2.2) which act on the upper surface of the flanks. The handle (4) is fitted into the central section and has a pin (4.5), which locates into holes (3.9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60N 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/2821 (2013.01); B60N 2/2875 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954160A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777517 A1 19991022; FR 2777517 B1 20000616; AU 2941199 A 19991108; EP 1073565 A1 20010207; WO 9954160 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INFANT'S CAR SEAT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-06-13 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 20010409 DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL