Global Patent Index - EP 1073597 A1

EP 1073597 A1 2001-02-07 - FLAT-BOTTOMED TANK AND METHOD FOR FITTING IT WITH A LEAK-PROOF COATING

Title (en)

FLAT-BOTTOMED TANK AND METHOD FOR FITTING IT WITH A LEAK-PROOF COATING

Title (de)

FLACHBODENTANK UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN AUSRÜSTUNG MIT EINER LECKSCHUTZAUSKLEIDUNG

Title (fr)

RESERVOIR A FOND PLAT ET SON PROCEDE D'EQUIPEMENT AVEC UN REVETEMENT ANTIFUITE

Publication

EP 1073597 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920668 A

Priority

  • DE 29807285 U
  • EP 9902517 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2328162A1] The invention relates to a flat-bottomed tank with a leak-proof coating used to store media hazardous to water and to a method for fitting, especially retrofitting, a flat-bottomed tank with a leak-proof coating. In view of the disadvantages of the state of the art, the aim of the invention is to provid e a flat-bottomed tank with a leak-proof coating which is easy to produce and assemble, can be fixed to the tank such that it is permanently media- and vacuum-proof and meets the requirements of leak-proofing controls. The invention also aims to provide an appropriate method, especially for retrofitting flat-bottomed tanks with a leak-proof coating. To this end, the medium-resistant plastic film (4) either covers the tank bottom (1) almost completely or extends as far as the lower region of the inner side (2') of t he tank wall (2) and is fixed peripherally at the level of the outer boundary o f the tank bottom (1) or at a short distance to the tank bottom (1) on the inn er side (2') by means of a clamping device (5), and the lining (3) covers the existing tank bottom (1) and extends no further than the clamping device (5) .

[origin: CA2328162A1] The invention relates to a flat-bottomed tank with a leak-proof coating used to store media hazardous to water and to a method for fitting, especially retrofitting, a flat-bottomed tank with a leak-proof coating. In view of the disadvantages of the state of the art, the aim of the invention is to provide a flat-bottomed tank with a leak-proof coating which is easy to produce and assemble, can be fixed to the tank such that it is permanently media- and vacuum-proof and meets the requirements of leak-proofing controls. The invention also aims to provide an appropriate method, especially for retrofitting flat-bottomed tanks with a leak-proof coating. To this end, the medium-resistant plastic film (4) either covers the tank bottom (1) almost completely or extends as far as the lower region of the inner side (2') of the tank wall (2) and is fixed peripherally at the level of the outer boundary of the tank bottom (1) or at a short distance to the tank bottom (1) on the inner side (2') by means of a clamping device (5), and the lining (3) covers the existing tank bottom (1) and extends no further than the clamping device (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 8/06 (2006.01); B65D 90/04 (2006.01); B65D 90/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/24 (2013.01); B65D 90/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954236A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807285 U1 19980730; AT 219745 T 20020715; AT 219746 T 20020715; AU 3816499 A 19991108; CA 2328162 A1 19991028; CZ 20003893 A3 20011212; CZ 295544 B6 20050817; DK 1073597 T3 20021014; EP 1073597 A1 20010207; EP 1073597 B1 20020626; EP 1083133 A1 20010314; EP 1083133 B1 20020626; ES 2178435 T3 20021216; HU 0103865 A2 20020328; HU 0103865 A3 20020429; NO 20005064 A 20001221; NO 20005064 D0 20001006; NO 318336 B1 20050307; PL 343621 A1 20010827; US 2001025853 A1 20011004; US 6431387 B2 20020813; WO 9954236 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070414

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070414

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070414

2008-02-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UTEK UMWELTSCHUTZTECHNOLOGIEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070414

2007-12-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060822

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178435 T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-09-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901857 20020801

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219745 T 20020715

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE