Global Patent Index - EP 1073674 A1

EP 1073674 A1 2001-02-07 - THIOL INHIBITORS OF ENDOTHELIN-CONVERTING ENZYME

Title (en)

THIOL INHIBITORS OF ENDOTHELIN-CONVERTING ENZYME

Title (de)

THIOL ENTHALTENDE INHIBITORE DES ENDOTHELIN KONVERTIERENDEN ENZYMS

Title (fr)

CERTAINS INHIBITEURS THIOL D'UNE ENZYME DE CONVERSION D'ENDOTHELINE

Publication

EP 1073674 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920729 A

Priority

  • EP 9902690 W
  • US 6526598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955726A1] Disclosed as endothelin converting enzyme inhibitors are the compounds of formula (I), wherein the variables have the meanings as defined hereinbefore.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 5/065; A61K 38/05; C07K 5/078

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/065 (2006.01); C07K 5/078 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/06139 (2013.01); C07K 5/06078 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955726A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955726 A1 19991104; AU 3819999 A 19991116; BR 9909805 A 20001226; CA 2323691 A1 19991104; CN 1297453 A 20010530; EP 1073674 A1 20010207; HU 0101640 A2 20010928; HU 0101640 A3 20021028; ID 26822 A 20010215; IL 138246 D0 20011031; JP 2002513032 A 20020508; JP 4350306 B2 20091021; NO 20005293 A 20001218; NO 20005293 D0 20001020; PL 343594 A1 20010827; RU 2000129510 A 20021110; SK 15812000 A3 20010312; ZA 200004680 B 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050113

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000824