Global patent index - EP 1073727 A2

EP 1073727 A2 2001-02-07 - HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES FROM OVARIAN TUMOUR TISSUE

Title (en)

HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES FROM OVARIAN TUMOUR TISSUE

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN AUS OVARTUMORGEWEBE

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE HUMAIN PROVENANT DE TISSU DE TUMEUR OVARIENNE

Publication

EP 1073727 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99945687 A

Priority

  • DE 9901087 W
  • DE 19817557 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817557A1] The invention relates to human nucleic acid sequences - mRNA, cDNA, genome sequences - of ovarian tumour tissue, which code for gene products or parts of these products, and to their use. The invention also relates to the polypeptides obtained by way of these sequences and to the use of same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/574 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/82 (2006.01); C07K 16/32 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953040A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817557 A1 19991021; EP 1073727 A2 20010207; EP 1291422 A2 20030312; EP 1291422 A3 20030319; JP 2002511252 A 20020416; WO 9953040 A2 19991021; WO 9953040 A3 20000706

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HINZMANN, BERND, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE, PROF.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPECHT, THOMAS, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PILARSKY, CHRISTIAN, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAHL, EDGAR, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040127

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METAGEN PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI NL PT SE