Global Patent Index - EP 1073740 A1

EP 1073740 A1 2001-02-07 - POLYNUCLEOTIDES ISOLATED FROM SKIN CELLS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE

Title (en)

POLYNUCLEOTIDES ISOLATED FROM SKIN CELLS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE

Title (de)

AUS HAUTZELLEN ISOLIERTE POLYNUKLEOTIDE UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE VERWENDUNG.

Title (fr)

POLYNUCLEOTIDES ISOLES DE CELLULES DE LA PEAU ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1073740 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922665 A

Priority

  • NZ 9900051 W
  • US 6972698 A
  • US 18893098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955865A1] Isolated polynucleotides encoding polypeptides expressed in mammalian skin cells are provided, together with expression vectors and host cells comprising such isolated polynucleotides. Methods for the use of such polynucleotides and polypeptides are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C12N 15/18; C12N 15/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/485 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 14/485 (2013.01); C07K 14/52 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955865 A1 19991104; AU 3961499 A 19991116; AU 758074 B2 20030313; CA 2327317 A1 19991104; CN 1158386 C 20040721; CN 1307637 A 20010808; EP 1073740 A1 20010207; EP 1073740 A4 20021113; JP 2002512798 A 20020508; NZ 507728 A 20020628

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036634

2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050128

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2002-11-20 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-11-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020927

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI SE

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 14/435 A, 7C 12N 15/12 B, 7C 12N 15/18 B, 7C 12N 15/19 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7A 61K 38/17 B

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI SE