Global Patent Index - EP 1073742 A2

EP 1073742 A2 2001-02-07 - HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF BLADDER TUMOUR TISSUE

Title (en)

HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF BLADDER TUMOUR TISSUE

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN AUS BLASENTUMORGEWEBE

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE PROVENANT DE TISSUS TUMORAUX DE LA VESSIE

Publication

EP 1073742 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99927682 A

Priority

  • DE 9901170 W
  • DE 19818619 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818619A1] Polypeptide fragment sequences (I) are new and comprise 55 open reading frame amino acid sequences given in the specification, that are highly expressed in bladder tumor. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a nucleic acid (II) encoding (I) selected from 50 nucleic acid sequences given in the specification, or its allelic variants or antisense sequences; (2) bacterial or phage artificial chromosomes and cosmid clones containing functional genes, or the chromosome region containing them, corresponding to (II) for use as gene transfer vehicles; (3) antisense sequences to (II); (4) an expression cassette (III) comprising (II), or their fragments, plus control and regulatory sequences; (5) DNA fragments (IV containing a gene isolated using (II); (6) host cells (V) containing (II) as a heterologous component; (7) recombinant production of (I), or their fragments, by culturing cells of (7); (8) an antibody (VI) directed against (I), or its fragments, encoded by (II); (9) 56 partial polypeptide sequences, all given in the specification, and sequences having at least 80% homology with them;

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/10 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954447A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818619 A1 19991028; EP 1073742 A2 20010207; JP 2002512023 A 20020423; WO 9954447 A2 19991028; WO 9954447 A3 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040809

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HINZMANN, BERND, DR.

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE, PROF.

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPECHT, THOMAS, DR.

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PILARSKY, CHRISTIAN, DR.

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAHL, EDGAR, DR.

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METAGEN PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE