Global Patent Index - EP 1073752 A1

EP 1073752 A1 2001-02-07 - PROTEIN WITH THE AMINO ACID SEQUENCE OF DELTA 7 STEROL REDUCTASE,ISOLATED cDNA MOLECULE CODING FOR SAID PROTEIN, RECOMBINANT DNA VECTOR AND BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVECOMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAID PROTEIN OR SAID cDNA MOLECULE

Title (en)

PROTEIN WITH THE AMINO ACID SEQUENCE OF DELTA 7 STEROL REDUCTASE,ISOLATED cDNA MOLECULE CODING FOR SAID PROTEIN, RECOMBINANT DNA VECTOR AND BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVECOMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAID PROTEIN OR SAID cDNA MOLECULE

Title (de)

PROTEIN MIT AMINOSÄURESEQUENZ DER DELTA7-STEROLREDUKTASE,ISOLIERTES cDNA-MOLEKÜL,DAS FÜR PROTEIN KODIERT, REKOMBINANTER DNA-VEKTOR UND BIOLOGISCH AKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE DAS PROTEIN ODER DAS cDNA-MOLEKÜL ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

PROTEINE AVEC SEQUENCE D'ACIDES AMINES DE LADELTA 7-STEROL REDUCTASE, MOLECULE ADNc ISOLEE CODANT LA PROTEINE,VECTEUR ADN RECOMBINANT ET COMPOSITIONS A ACTION BIOLOGIQUE CONTENANT LA PROTEINE OU LA MOLECULE ADNc

Publication

EP 1073752 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98967140 A

Priority

  • DE 19739940 A
  • EP 9805465 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739940A1] The invention relates to the cDNA, the protein coded by the open reading frame and the gene for the human enzyme DELTA 7 sterol reductase, revealing the amino acid sequence of human DELTA 7 sterol reductase and of the gene of human DELTA 7 sterol reductase. The invention also provides methods for producing and isolating the human DELTA 7 sterol reductase enzyme and for producing sections of the gene and of the cDNA. Biologically active compositions containing the inventive protein, the isolated cDNA molecule or a recombinant DNA vector either as a whole or in sections in a suitable carrier material can be used for diagnostic and pharmaceutical purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/53; A61K 38/44; A61K 48/00; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/02; C12N 15/85; C12Q 1/26; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/001 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913086A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739940 A1 19990318; EP 1073752 A1 20010207; WO 9913086 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130301

2009-05-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOCRATES LIFE SCIENCES AG

2006-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOCRATES LIFE SCIENCES GMBH

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE