Global Patent Index - EP 1073758 A1

EP 1073758 A1 2001-02-07 - RETROVIRAL VECTORS INCLUDING MODIFIED ENVELOPE ESCORT PROTEINS

Title (en)

RETROVIRAL VECTORS INCLUDING MODIFIED ENVELOPE ESCORT PROTEINS

Title (de)

RETROVIRALE VEKTOREN MIT MODIFIZIERTEN 'ESKORT'-HÜLLPROTEINEN

Title (fr)

VECTEURS RETROVIRAUX INCLUANT DES PROTEINES D'ESCORTE A ENVELOPPE MODIFIEE

Publication

EP 1073758 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914700 A

Priority

  • IB 9900764 W
  • US 6939898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955893A1] A retroviral vector comprising a first retroviral envelope protein and at least one modified retroviral envelope protein, wherein said first retroviral envelope protein includes a surface protein comprising (i) a receptor binding region; (ii) a hypervariable polyproline region; and (iii) a body portion, and said modified retroviral envelope protein, prior to modification, includes a surface protein which includes (i) a receptor binding region; (ii) a hypervariable polyproline region; and (iii) a body portion, characterized in that said modified retroviral envelope protein has been modified such that at least 90 % of the amino acid residues of the receptor binding region of said surface protein of said modified retroviral envelope protein have been removed and replaced with a non-retroviral protein or peptide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/15; C07K 19/00; C12N 15/48; C12N 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/26 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/15 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 7/04 (2006.01); C12N 15/48 (2006.01); C12N 15/867 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C12N 2740/13043 (2013.01); C12N 2740/13045 (2013.01); C12N 2810/40 (2013.01); C12N 2810/405 (2013.01); C12N 2810/55 (2013.01); C12N 2810/80 (2013.01); C12N 2810/851 (2013.01); C12N 2810/857 (2013.01); C12N 2810/859 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955893A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955893 A1 19991104; CA 2326407 A1 19991104; CA 2326407 C 20120911; EP 1073758 A1 20010207; IL 139016 D0 20011125; JP 2002514388 A 20020521; NZ 507645 A 20040625; NZ 532894 A 20051028

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090604

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2005-10-12 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2005-08-10 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE