Global Patent Index - EP 1073774 A1

EP 1073774 A1 2001-02-07 - MAGNESIUM ALLOYING

Title (en)

MAGNESIUM ALLOYING

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG EINER LEGIERUNG AUF MAGNESIUMBASIS

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION D'UN ALLIAGE A BASE DE MAGNESIUM

Publication

EP 1073774 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910034 A

Priority

  • AU 9900189 W
  • AU PP246998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949089A1] A method is provided for producing an Mg-Al alloy in an alloying vessel containing molten Mg or molten Mg alloy. The method includes the steps of establishing the temperature of the molten Mg or Mg alloy in the range of 650-750 DEG C and thereafter adding a solid master alloy containing Al and Mn to the alloying vessel whereby Mn is released for reaction with Fe in the alloying vessel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/03; C22C 21/06; C22C 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/03 (2006.01); C22C 21/06 (2006.01); C22C 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 23/02 (2013.01); C22C 1/03 (2013.01); C22C 21/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949089 A1 19990930; AU PP246998 D0 19980409; CA 2324961 A1 19990930; CZ 20003374 A3 20011114; EP 1073774 A1 20010207; EP 1073774 A4 20020123; IL 138526 D0 20011031; IS 5630 A 20000919; MX PA00009225 A 20020604; NO 20004676 A 20001109; NO 20004676 D0 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-03-06 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 20011120 DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 1/03 A, 7C 22C 21/06 B, 7C 22C 23/02 B, 7C 22C 1/02 B

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH OR

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUSTRALIAN MAGNESIUM OPERATIONS PTY., LTD.

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL