Global Patent Index - EP 1073780 A1

EP 1073780 A1 2001-02-07 - ELECTROLYSIS APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HALOGEN GASES

Title (en)

ELECTROLYSIS APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HALOGEN GASES

Title (de)

ELEKTROLYSEAPPARAT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALOGENGASEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'ELECTROLYSE POUR PRODUIRE DES GAZ HALOGENE

Publication

EP 1073780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916899 A

Priority

  • DE 19816334 A
  • EP 9902200 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19816334A1] The invention relates to an electrolysis apparatus for producing halogen gases from an aqueous alkali halogen solution, comprising several electrically connected plate-shaped electrolysis cells arranged in a pile and respectively provided with a housing consisting of two half shells made of an electro-conductive material and fitted with outer contact strips on at least one rear wall of said housing, also including two respective planar electrodes (anode and cathode), whereby the anode and cathode are provided with louver-like orifices so that the electrolytic feed material and products can flow though, said anode and cathode are separated from each other by means of a partition wall, are arranged parallel to each other and are electroconductively connected to the associated rear wall of the housing by means of metal reinforcements. The aim of the invention is to provide an apparatus which can operate at flow densities of more than 4 kA/m<2> with correspondingly higher production of gas in the boundary layer while maintaining a sustainable service life for the membrane and requiring few pulses. This is achieved by slanting the louver-like orifices (8B, 9B) of the anode (8) and cathode (9) towards the horizontal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 1/24 (2006.01); C25B 9/00 (2006.01); C25B 9/08 (2006.01); C25B 9/18 (2006.01); C25B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 11/02 (2013.01); C25B 9/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953122A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816334 A1 19991014; AR 019037 A1 20011226; AT 213286 T 20020215; AU 3522099 A 19991101; AU 742537 B2 20020103; BR 9909589 A 20001219; CA 2328150 A1 19991021; CA 2328150 C 20091208; CN 1142326 C 20040317; CN 1296530 A 20010523; EP 1073780 A1 20010207; EP 1073780 B1 20020213; JO 2116 B 20000521; JP 2002511530 A 20020416; JP 4460770 B2 20100512; KR 100549653 B1 20060208; MA 24828 A1 19991231; NO 20005082 A 20001211; NO 20005082 D0 20001009; PL 343179 A1 20010730; RU 2215064 C2 20031027; TN SN99037 A1 20011231; TW 494144 B 20020711; US 6503377 B1 20030107; WO 9953122 A1 19991021; ZA 9902619 B 20001012

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900867

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UHDE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-12-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-04-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-03-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-04-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-15 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-06 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

2002-12-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: KRUPP UHDE GMBH TRANSFER- UHDE GMBH

2002-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

2002-09-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900867 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213286 T 20020215

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BORUCINSKI, THOMAS

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEGNER, JUERGEN

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DULLE, KARL-HEINZ

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLLNY, MARTIN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BORUCINSKI, THOMAS

2001-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEGNER, JUERGEN

2001-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DULLE, KARL-HEINZ

2001-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLLNY, MARTIN

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE