Global Patent Index - EP 1073805 A1

EP 1073805 A1 2001-02-07 - APPARATUS AND METHODS OF FORMING A CURVED STRUCTURE

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHODS OF FORMING A CURVED STRUCTURE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GEBOGENEN STRUKTUR

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UNE STRUCTURE COURBE

Publication

EP 1073805 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919857 A

Priority

US 9808187 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955977A1] An apparatus (10) for forming curved structures having a plurality of pivotally connected sections (12), each section having a track portion (16, 18), and a strap member (24, 26) slidably engaging the track portion of the sections such that the sections are movable to form a radius of curvature. A method of forming a curved structure involves providing runners having a plurality of pivotally connected sections, each section having track portions, and each runner further having two strap members slidably engaging each of the track portions. The method also includes placing runners (42, 44) in an opposed relationship in a curved position such that the runners are substantially aligned, and attaching studs (46) between the runners.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70; E04G 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04B 9/06 (2006.01); E04C 3/40 (2006.01); E04F 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/06 (2013.01); E04B 2/7457 (2013.01); E04C 3/40 (2013.01); E04F 13/06 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7481 (2013.01); E04F 2013/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955977 A1 19991104; AU 7255398 A 19991116; AU 760162 B2 20030508; CA 2330125 A1 19991104; CA 2330125 C 20050906; DE 69834746 D1 20060706; DE 69834746 T2 20070503; EP 1073805 A1 20010207; EP 1073805 A4 20040303; EP 1073805 B1 20060531

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69834746 P 20060706

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEX-ABILITY CONCEPTS, L.L.C.

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2004-03-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040122

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI SE