Global Patent Index - EP 1073813 A1

EP 1073813 A1 2001-02-07 - SUPPORT PLATE MADE OF A FOIL-LIKE PLASTIC MATERIAL FOR A PLATE-LINED FLOOR STRUCTURE OR WALL

Title (en)

SUPPORT PLATE MADE OF A FOIL-LIKE PLASTIC MATERIAL FOR A PLATE-LINED FLOOR STRUCTURE OR WALL

Title (de)

TRÄGERPLATTE AUS FOLIENARTIGEM KUNSTSTOFF FÜR EINEN PLATTENBEKLEIDETEN BODENAUFBAU ODER EINE WAND

Title (fr)

PLAQUE DE SUPPORT DU TYPE FEUILLE DE PLASTIQUE POUR UN REVETEMENT DE SOL OU DE MUR

Publication

EP 1073813 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919242 A

Priority

  • DE 29807258 U
  • EP 9902549 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2329620A1] The invention relates to a support and/or drainage plate made of a foil-like plastic material, for use with a plate-lined floor structure or a wall so as to create a space between the ground and the surface lining to be applied on to the foil-like plate. The structure of the plate is such that cavities are created by means of, on the one side, projections extending substantially in one direction and, on the other side, raised areas at the same level between which chambers are embodied for receiving a hardening contact medium, such a s mortar or adhesive, which forms a contact layer with the surface lining to b e applied. According to the invention the structure consists of projections (N 1, N2) or (S1, S2) which extend in at least two directions and intersect. The resulting chambers (M1) are delimited in their circumference by the projections (S1, S2), which are open towards the other side of the plate.</S DOAB>

[origin: CA2329620A1] The invention relates to a support and/or drainage plate made of a foil-like plastic material, for use with a plate-lined floor structure or a wall so as to create a space between the ground and the surface lining to be applied onto the foil-like plate. The structure of the plate is such that cavities are created by means of, on the one side, projections extending substantially in one direction and, on the other side, raised areas at the same level between which chambers are embodied for receiving a hardening contact medium, such as mortar or adhesive, which forms a contact layer with the surface lining to be applied. According to the invention the structure consists of projections (N1, N2) or (S1, S2) which extend in at least two directions and intersect. The resulting chambers (M1) are delimited in their circumference by the projections (S1, S2), which are open towards the other side of the plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/80 (2006.01); E02D 31/02 (2006.01); E04B 1/64 (2006.01); E04D 11/00 (2006.01); E04F 13/04 (2006.01); E04F 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/801 (2013.01); E02D 31/02 (2013.01); E04D 11/00 (2013.01); E04F 15/18 (2013.01); E04F 15/182 (2013.01); E04F 15/185 (2013.01); E04F 15/186 (2013.01); E02D 2300/0004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807258 U1 19980806; AT 257202 T 20040115; AU 3708499 A 19991108; CA 2329620 A1 19991028; CA 2329620 C 20050726; CZ 20003863 A3 20010516; CZ 300842 B6 20090826; DK 1073813 T3 20040419; DK 1073813 T4 20130422; EP 1073813 A1 20010207; EP 1073813 B1 20040102; EP 1073813 B2 20130327; ES 2209429 T3 20040616; ES 2209429 T5 20130828; PL 204679 B1 20100129; PL 343671 A1 20010827; TR 200003085 T2 20010321; US 6434901 B1 20020820; WO 9954571 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-23 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59908201

2015-04-23 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59908201

2013-08-28 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2209429 T5

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-14 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-05-16 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59908201

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-04-22 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2013-03-28 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2013-03-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ISOLA AS

2005-07-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ISOLA AS

- Effective date: 20041004

2005-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ISOLA AS

2004-11-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ISOLA AS

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209429 T3

2004-04-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908201 P 20040205

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2003-07-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SUPPORT PLATE MADE OF A FOIL-LIKE PLASTIC MATERIAL FOR A PLATE-LINED FLOOR STRUCTURE OR WALL

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHLUETER SYSTEMS KG

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020729

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL