Global Patent Index - EP 1073820 A1

EP 1073820 A1 2001-02-07 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HINGE HAVING AN INTEGRATED BRAKING AND HOLDING FUNCTION

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HINGE HAVING AN INTEGRATED BRAKING AND HOLDING FUNCTION

Title (de)

KRAFTWAGENTÜRSCHARNIER MIT INTEGRIERTER BREMS- UND HALTEFUNKTION

Title (fr)

CHARNIERE DE PORTIERE DE VOITURE A FONCTION DE FREINAGE ET D'ARRET INTEGREE

Publication

EP 1073820 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99945725 A

Priority

  • DE 9900256 W
  • DE 19817699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817699A1] The invention relates to a motor vehicle door hinge having an integrated braking and holding function. Said door hinge is comprised of a first hinge half (1) which acts upon a door assembly part, a door, or a door pillar, and of a second hinge halve (2) which acts upon another door assembly part. The door hinge also comprises a hinge pin (3) which pivotally connects both hinge halves to one another. The hinge pin is made of a solid material and is accommodated in at least one hinge eye (14) of a hinge half with a running fit and is accommodated in at least one hinge eye (6) of the other hinge half with a close fit. A braking and holding device which is integrated in the hinge comprises at least one spring-loaded braking and holding body (8). Said braking and holding body is aligned in a radial manner relative to the hinge pin and interacts with a circumferential profile of the hinge pin (3), said profile extending over a part of the circumference thereof. The aim of the invention is to obtain an increasing braking of the opening movement of the doors over a predetermined permitted opening angle of the doors, and inversely to obtain a progressively easier closing movement of the doors. To this end, the circumferential profile of the hinge pin which extends over a part of the circumference thereof forms a braking ramp (9) comprising a contour which continuously increases in the door opening direction. In addition, the braking and holding body (8) which interacts with said braking ramp (9) is configured as a friction body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05D 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/084 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53848 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54025 (2013.01); Y10T 16/540257 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5403 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54034 (2013.01); Y10T 16/557 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954582A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817699 A1 19991104; AU 3247499 A 19991108; BR 9909763 A 20001219; CN 1297507 A 20010530; DE 19980711 D2 20010510; EP 1073820 A1 20010207; EP 1073820 B1 20011024; ES 2167119 T3 20020501; JP 2002512330 A 20020423; MX PA00010341 A 20020621; US 6473937 B1 20021105; WO 9954582 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ED. SCHARWAECHTER GMBH, 42855 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59900355

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900355

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167119 T3

2002-04-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011024

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-12-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900355 20011129

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE