Global Patent Index - EP 1073833 A1

EP 1073833 A1 2001-02-07 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPROVING COMBUSTION IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPROVING COMBUSTION IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VERBRENNUNG BEI EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR AMELIORER LA COMBUSTION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1073833 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00907703 A

Priority

  • FR 0000450 W
  • FR 9902238 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790038A1] The combustion of a fuel and an oxidizing gas is improved by passing the gas through an organic solid before mixing with the fuel. The solid is sublimed and forms 0.5 - 15 ppm of the fuel/gas mixture. An Independent claim is also included for a filter for an oxidizing gas that has a cartridge within a casing having a gas inlet and outlet. The cartridge has perforated tubes containing an organic solid that is sublimed by the gas. The cartridge has an elastic band supporting the tubes. Preferred Features: The solid is a compacted powder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0050760A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790038 A1 20000825; AU 2920200 A 20000914; BR 0004979 A 20001226; CA 2329404 A1 20000831; CN 1297512 A 20010530; EP 1073833 A1 20010207; JP 2002538356 A 20021112; PL 343763 A1 20010910; WO 0050760 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-04 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20030722

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOISSET, JEAN-LOUIS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGLER-LATHROP, PATRICK JEAN GEORGES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BOISSET, JEAN-LOUIS

2005-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SIEGLER-LATHROP, PATRICK JEAN GEORGES

2005-05-04 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030722

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20001027;SI