Global Patent Index - EP 1073836 A1

EP 1073836 A1 2001-02-07 - NOZZLE ELEMENT FOR DOSING LIQUIDS OR GASES

Title (en)

NOZZLE ELEMENT FOR DOSING LIQUIDS OR GASES

Title (de)

DÜSENEINHEIT ZUR DOSIERUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN ODER GASEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE BUSE POUR LE DOSAGE DE LIQUIDES OU DE GAZ

Publication

EP 1073836 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907430 A

Priority

  • DE 0000123 W
  • DE 19907356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049287A1] The invention relates to a nozzle element (2) for dosing liquids or gases. Said nozzle element comprises a nozzle body (4) and a nozzle needle (6) which is mounted in a guide bore (5) of the nozzle body (4) and can be displaced between an open and a closed position. Said nozzle needle (6) controls at least one metering opening (9) which communicates with the guide bore (5). Said nozzle needle rests against a sealing seat (8) of the nozzle body (4) in the closed position. The invention relates to a nozzle element (2) the nozzle needle (6) of which opens into the interior and has a dead stroke (hT). Said inventive nozzle element (2) is preferably configured as an injector for a common-rail injection system of an internal combustion engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/10; F02M 45/00; F02M 61/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 21/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/042 (2013.01); F02M 45/00 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049287A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049287 A1 20000824; DE 19907356 A1 20001012; EP 1073836 A1 20010207; EP 1073836 B1 20041020; JP 2002537516 A 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008301 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE