Global Patent Index - EP 1073837 A1

EP 1073837 A1 2001-02-07 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1073837 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957895 A

Priority

  • DE 9903284 W
  • DE 19907897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19907897A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve, especially a high pressure injection valve for directly injecting fuel into a combustion chamber of a mixture-compressed spark ignition internal combustion engine. The invention is characterized in that a conical section with a valve seat surface (27) is formed in a valve seat element (26), an outlet port (32) being attached to said conical section directly downstream. The outlet port (32) has an inlet plane (52), an outlet plane (53) and a central axis (58), wherein the central point (54) of the inlet plane (52) is staggered in relation to the longitudinal axis (8) of the valve and the central axis (58) is slanted relative to the longitudinal axis (8) of the valve. A disk-shaped turbulence element (47) is disposed downstream from the valve seat element (26) which is used to generate a right-handed and a left-handed turbulence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/162 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0050765A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19907897 A1 20000831; EP 1073837 A1 20010207; EP 1073837 B1 20050316; JP 2002538358 A 20021112; RU 2239088 C2 20041027; US 6494388 B1 20021217; WO 0050765 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141013

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061013

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061013

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911766 P 20050421

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030922

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE