Global Patent Index - EP 1073897 A1

EP 1073897 A1 2001-02-07 - LUMINESCENT LIFETIME-BASED MEASUREMENT OF SODIUM CONCENTRATION

Title (en)

LUMINESCENT LIFETIME-BASED MEASUREMENT OF SODIUM CONCENTRATION

Title (de)

AUF DER LUMINESZENZ-LEBENSDAUER BASIERENDE BESTIMMUNG DER NATRIUM KONZENTRATION

Title (fr)

MESURE, BASEE SUR LA DUREE DE VIE DE LUMINESCENCE, DE LA CONCENTRATION DE SODIUM

Publication

EP 1073897 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912686 A

Priority

  • US 9905980 W
  • US 7885698 P
  • US 11155498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947918A1] A system and method of optically measuring Na<+> and K<+> in a sample such as blood which contains high concentrations Na<+> (up to 160 mM) and K<+> (up to 6.5 mM) using a photoluminescent probe having intrinsic analyte-induced lifetime changes. Specifically, the use of lifetime-based sensing of Na<+> and K<+> at the extracellular concentrations present in whole blood or blood serum. The preferred embodiment uses phase-modulation fluorometry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/20; G01N 21/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/52 (2006.01); G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01N 33/84 (2006.01); G01N 21/77 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/84 (2013.01); G01N 21/6408 (2013.01); G01N 2021/7786 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947918 A1 19990923; CA 2325140 A1 19990923; EP 1073897 A1 20010207; EP 1073897 A4 20061025

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080115

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/52 20060101AFI20070731BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/64 20060101ALI20070731BHEP

2007-10-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LUMINESCENT LIFETIME-BASED MEASUREMENT OF SODIUM CONCENTRATION

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070306

2006-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060921

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT