Global Patent Index - EP 1073919 A1

EP 1073919 A1 2001-02-07 - Optical communication system with segmented diffraction gratings

Title (en)

Optical communication system with segmented diffraction gratings

Title (de)

Optisches Übertragungssystem mit segmentierten Beugungsgittern

Title (fr)

Système de communication optique utilisant des réseaux de diffraction segmentés

Publication

EP 1073919 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918461 A

Priority

  • US 9907391 W
  • US 8298998 P
  • US 11533198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956159A1] Methods and apparatus are disclosed that apply a predetermined complex-valued spectral transfer function to an input optical field to produce an output field that propagates in an output direction. Methods for making such apparatus are also disclosed. Segmented gratings (1915, 1916, 19a15, 19a16) fabricated according to one example comprise a series of spatially distinct subgratings arrayed end to end. Each subgrating possesses a periodic array of diffraction structures, such as lines or other elements. The transfer functions of such segmented gratings are determined by controlling (a) the spatial periodicity or frequency of each subgrating, (b) the amplitude of each subgrating, (c) the spacing between the last diffraction structure (or line) on each subgrating and the first diffraction structure (or line) of the successive subgrating, and (d) the optical path length and transparency through each subgrating, or each subgrating plus additional material layers utilized to control optical path length and transparency. Communication systems using such segmented gratings are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 5/18; G02B 6/293; H04J 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/18 (2006.01); G02B 6/34 (2006.01); G02B 27/44 (2006.01); G06K 9/74 (2006.01); H04B 10/02 (2006.01); H04B 10/28 (2006.01); H04J 14/00 (2006.01); H04J 14/04 (2006.01); H04J 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/29311 (2013.01); G02B 5/1814 (2013.01); G06K 9/74 (2013.01); H04J 14/005 (2013.01); G02B 6/02085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956159 A1 19991104; CA 2330109 A1 19991104; CA 2330109 C 20040203; EP 1073919 A1 20010207; EP 1073919 A4 20050518; JP 2002513166 A 20020508; JP 4530536 B2 20100825

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-07-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH SEGMENTED DIFFRACTION GRATINGS

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050712

2005-05-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 5/18 A

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 6/293 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04J 13/02 B

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE