Global Patent Index - EP 1073933 A1

EP 1073933 A1 2001-02-07 - OPTICALLY NON-LINEAR SEMICONDUCTOR MATERIAL AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

OPTICALLY NON-LINEAR SEMICONDUCTOR MATERIAL AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

OPTISCH NICHTLINEARES HALBLEITERMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MATERIAU SEMI-CONDUCTEUR OPTIQUEMENT NON LINEAIRE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1073933 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913054 A

Priority

  • CH 9900157 W
  • CH 98298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9957603A1] Essentially non-linear optical material characteristics of a semiconductor material which is epitaxially grown at low temperatures can be substantially improved by measures comprising the addition of foreign atoms and/or an additional curing. Epitaxially grown GaAs is dosed, for example at 300 DEG C, with Be in a concentration of 3 x 10<19> cm<-3>. The response time is reduced from 480 fs (curve 1.1) to 110 fs (curve 3.1) such that the absorption modulation is not reduced thereby or such that the non-saturable absorption losses do not increase. Semiconductor materials which have been subjected to at least one of the aforementioned measures during production exhibit impressionable, especially short response times and, at the same time, exhibit high absorption modulations and low non-saturable absorption losses. As a result, the semiconductor materials are excellently suited for non-linear optical applications such as optical information processing, optical communication or ultra-short pulse laser physics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/35; H01S 3/098

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/35 (2006.01); G02F 1/355 (2006.01); H01S 3/098 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/1118 (2013.01); G02F 1/3523 (2013.01); G02F 1/3551 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957603A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9957603 A1 19991111; EP 1073933 A1 20010207; US 6551850 B1 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030703

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KELLER, URSULA

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SIEGNER, UWE

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAIML, MARKUS

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIGATERA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI