Global patent index - EP 1073936 A1

EP 1073936 A1 2001-02-07 - METHODS OF MAKING CHARGE GENERATION LAYERS CONTAINING CHARGE TRANSPORT COMPOUND, AND PHOTOCONDUCTORS CONTAINING THE SAME

Title (en)

METHODS OF MAKING CHARGE GENERATION LAYERS CONTAINING CHARGE TRANSPORT COMPOUND, AND PHOTOCONDUCTORS CONTAINING THE SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LADUNGSERZEUGUNGSSCHICHTEN MIT EINER LADUNGSTRANSPORTVERBINDUNG, UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHOTOCONDUKTOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE COUCHES PRODUCTRICES DE CHARGE QUI CONTIENNENT UN COMPOSE DE TRANSPORT DE CHARGE, ET PHOTOCONDUCTEURS CONTENANT CELLES-CI

Publication

EP 1073936 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921456 A

Priority

  • US 9908917 W
  • US 6628498 A
  • US 21933198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956180A1] Methods of making a charge generation layer comprise premixing a charge generation compound, a charge transport compound and solvent to form a premix essentially free of polymeric binder, mixing the premix with at least one polymeric binder to form a dispersion, and coating the dispersion on a substrate. Photoconductors comprising a substrate, a charge transport layer and a charge generation layer formed by such a method exhibit improved electrical sensitivity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/02; G03G 5/043; G03G 5/047; G03G 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/0525 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956180 A1 19991104; AU 3866299 A 19991116; CN 1303491 A 20010711; DE 69933864 D1 20061214; DE 69933864 T2 20070531; EP 1073936 A1 20010207; EP 1073936 A4 20041027; EP 1073936 B1 20061102

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100423

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69933864

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-12-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-10-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 03G 15/02 A

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 03G 5/05 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 03G 5/047 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 03G 5/043 B

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FULLER, STERRITT, R.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAGGQUIST, GREGORY, WALTER

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KIERSTEIN, LAURA, LEE

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEVIN, RONALD, HAROLD

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MOSIER, SCOTT, THOMAS

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NEELY, JENNIFER, KAYE

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RANDOLPH, CATHERINE, MAILHE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB