Global Patent Index - EP 1074006 A2

EP 1074006 A2 2001-02-07 - COIN DEPOSIT LOCK FOR SHOPPING TROLLEYS

Title (en)

COIN DEPOSIT LOCK FOR SHOPPING TROLLEYS

Title (de)

MÜNZPFANDSCHLOSS FÜR EINKAUFSWAGEN

Title (fr)

SERRURE DE CONSIGNE POUR CHARIOTS DE SUPERMARCHE

Publication

EP 1074006 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99927675 A

Priority

  • DE 9901151 W
  • DE 19817380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817380A1] The mechanism has a housing (1) in which there is a mechanical latch consisting of a pair of rotational elements (2) that engage a coupling element when there is no coin inserted. When a coin is inserted (13) pivot mounted fingers (5) expand to cause the rotational elements to move in an arc and so effect release

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0654 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953793A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817380 A1 19991021; AU 4497099 A 19991108; EP 1074006 A2 20010207; EP 1074006 B1 20011205; WO 9953793 A2 19991028; WO 9953793 A3 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-01-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030116

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900502 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT