Global Patent Index - EP 1074007 A1

EP 1074007 A1 2001-02-07 - ON-BOARD SYSTEM COMPRISING NETWORK INTERFACE MEANS AND METHOD FOR ACTIVATING APPLICATIONS LOCATED IN SAID ON-BOARD SYSTEM

Title (en)

ON-BOARD SYSTEM COMPRISING NETWORK INTERFACE MEANS AND METHOD FOR ACTIVATING APPLICATIONS LOCATED IN SAID ON-BOARD SYSTEM

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTES SYSTEM MIT MITTEL FÜR NETZWERKSCHNITTSTELLEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUM AKTIVIEREN DER IN DEM INTEGRIERTEN SYSTEM GESPEICHERTEN ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME EMBARQUE POSSEDANT DES MOYENS D'INTERFACE DE RESEAU, ET PROCEDE D'ACTIVATION D'APPLICATIONS LOCALISEES DANS CE SYSTEME EMBARQUE

Publication

EP 1074007 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00906418 A

Priority

  • FR 0000400 W
  • FR 9902056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049584A1] The invention concerns a method for activating (Ai) applications (A1-An) of an on-board system, in particular of a chip card (2a) connected to a terminal (1) provided with a reader, via a WEB -type browser. The terminal (1) and the chip card (2a) comprise each, besides the conventional protocol layers (101-102), corresponding to the ISO 7816 standards, a specific layer (13, 23a). The latter comprises intelligent agents (132, 232a1) for setting up two-way data exchange sessions, thereby enabling the chip card (2a) to have a WEB server functionality. Moreover, the chip card (2a) comprises intelligent agents (ATS1-ATSn), called script translators, interacting with the applications (A1-An), thereby enabling to activate a selected application (Ai), using conventional orders, corresponding to ISO 7816 standards. In another embodiment, provision is made for dynamic updating of the chip card (2a), in particular from a browser. The invention also concerns the corresponding on-board system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 15/00 (2006.01); G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01); H04L 12/00 (2006.01); H04L 29/02 (2006.01); H04L 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3552 (2013.01); G06Q 20/357 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049584A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049584 A1 20000824; AU 2809900 A 20000904; AU 775230 B2 20040722; CA 2329044 A1 20000824; CA 2329044 C 20110712; CN 1179307 C 20041208; CN 1352782 A 20020605; EP 1074007 A1 20010207; FR 2790629 A1 20000908; JP 2002537617 A 20021105; JP 3913984 B2 20070509; TW 462029 B 20011101; US 6839756 B1 20050104

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160609

2016-03-02 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-02-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160127

2008-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080204

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CP8 TECHNOLOGIES

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE