Global Patent Index - EP 1074030 A1

EP 1074030 A1 2001-02-07 - SWITCHING DEVICE WITH INTERRUPTER CHAMBER MODULE

Title (en)

SWITCHING DEVICE WITH INTERRUPTER CHAMBER MODULE

Title (de)

SCHALTGERÄT MIT EINER SCHALTKAMMER-BAUGRUPPE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION COMPORTANT UN MODULE A CHAMBRE DE COUPURE

Publication

EP 1074030 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927662 A

Priority

  • DE 9901116 W
  • DE 19818058 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818058A1] The inventive structure of the interrupter chamber module (1) comprises two side walls (5). A contact pressure spring (2), a contact bridge (3) and a slide (4) can be successively mounted in the space (7) between said walls by simply stacking said components from a side. To this end, the interrupter chamber module (1) must have a passage on the component insertion side, the length of which should be at least that of the contact bridge (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/20 (2006.01); H01H 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/2008 (2013.01); H01H 9/345 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954897A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818058 A1 19991104; DE 19818058 C2 20001214; CN 1127103 C 20031105; CN 1277729 A 20001220; EP 1074030 A1 20010207; EP 1074030 B1 20020626; US 6556110 B1 20030429; WO 9954897 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901859 20020801

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT