Global Patent Index - EP 1074060 A1

EP 1074060 A1 2001-02-07 - COPLANAR OSCILLATOR CIRCUIT STRUCTURES

Title (en)

COPLANAR OSCILLATOR CIRCUIT STRUCTURES

Title (de)

KOPLANARE OSZILLATORSCHALTUNGSSTURKTUREN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURES DE MONTAGES OSCILLATEURS COPLANAIRES

Publication

EP 1074060 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918660 A

Priority

US 9808234 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956341A1] An oscillator circuit (20) having a flip chip metalization pattern and base substrate metalization pattern is defined such that a common-drain oscillator is configured with the common drain (38) interposed between the source (40) and gate (36) terminals, providing an effective RF common reference with reduced parasitic inductance elements which otherwise degrade oscillator power and phase noise at high frequencies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 7/08; H03B 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/08 (2006.01); H03B 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03B 5/1852 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956341 A1 19991104; AU 7154398 A 19991116; AU 748809 B2 20020613; BR 9815827 A 20001212; CA 2328942 A1 19991104; CA 2328942 C 20070717; CN 1294763 A 20010509; EP 1074060 A1 20010207; EP 1074060 A4 20040310; IL 138980 A 20040104; IL 138980 D0 20011125; JP 2002513229 A 20020508; JP 4088859 B2 20080521; MX PA00010238 A 20030312

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090526

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDWAVE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040126

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE