Global Patent Index - EP 1074061 A2

EP 1074061 A2 2001-02-07 - CENTRALLY FED ANTENNA SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING SUCH AN ANTENNA SYSTEM

Title (en)

CENTRALLY FED ANTENNA SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING SUCH AN ANTENNA SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZENTRAL GESPEISTES ANTENNENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM OPTIMIEREN EINES SOLCHEN ANTENNENSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ANTENNE A ALIMENTATION CENTRALE ET PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION D'UN TEL SYSTEME D'ANTENNE

Publication

EP 1074061 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99927692 A

Priority

  • DE 9901188 W
  • DE 19817766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817766A1] The invention relates to a centrally fed antenna system whose effective reflector surface is formed in such a way that a maximum of the copolar far field is located on the illuminated coverage surface in line with far field requirements and a minimum of the copolar near field is located in the feed system, e. g. on the aperture of a feed horn.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/14 (2006.01); H01Q 19/02 (2006.01); H01Q 19/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/023 (2013.01); H01Q 15/141 (2013.01); H01Q 19/021 (2013.01); H01Q 19/025 (2013.01); H01Q 19/028 (2013.01); H01Q 19/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954955A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817766 A1 19991111; CA 2329739 A1 19991028; CA 2329739 C 20040224; CN 1292939 A 20010425; DK 1074061 T3 20030106; EP 1074061 A2 20010207; EP 1074061 B1 20021211; JP 2002512462 A 20020423; US 6489929 B1 20021203; WO 9954955 A2 19991028; WO 9954955 A3 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160420

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160421

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903754

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-12-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030420

2003-12-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030420

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903754 20030123

2003-01-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE