Global Patent Index - EP 1074064 A1

EP 1074064 A1 2001-02-07 - APPARATUS FOR TRACKING MOVING SATELLITES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR TRACKING MOVING SATELLITES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFOLGUNG VON NICHT-GEOSTATIONÄREN SATELLITEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE POURSUITE DE SATELLITES A DEFILEMENT

Publication

EP 1074064 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99913414 A

Priority

  • FR 9900881 W
  • FR 9805112 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778043A1] The electronic switching mechanism controls the transmit/receive elements used and allows several satellite signals to be transmitted and received on the elements at the same time

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 19/06; H01Q 3/14; H01Q 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/14 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/062 (2013.01); H01Q 3/14 (2013.01); H01Q 5/45 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956347A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778043 A1 19991029; AU 3154499 A 19991116; BR 9910135 A 20010130; CN 1122330 C 20030924; CN 1297594 A 20010530; DE 69925827 D1 20050721; DE 69925827 T2 20060504; EP 1074064 A1 20010207; EP 1074064 B1 20050615; ES 2244185 T3 20051201; HU 0101576 A2 20010928; HU 0101576 A3 20030528; ID 27828 A 20010426; JP 2002513230 A 20020508; JP 4219556 B2 20090204; US 2003020652 A1 20030130; WO 9956347 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69925827

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120415

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120415

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110428

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070415

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060417

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060417

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244185 T3

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69925827 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020805

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT