Global patent index - EP 1074091 A2

EP 1074091 A2 2001-02-07 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING A VIDEO PROTOCOL IN A NETWORK ENVIRONMENT

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING A VIDEO PROTOCOL IN A NETWORK ENVIRONMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES VIDEOPROTOKOLLS IN EINER NETZWERKUMGEBUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRISE EN CHARGE D'UN PROTOCOLE VIDEO DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT RESEAU

Publication

EP 1074091 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99918718 A

Priority

  • US 9908673 W
  • US 6349298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955013A2] A method and apparatus of supporting a video protocol in a network environment. Video processing and hardware requirements associated with a receiver are minimized by specifying a single video protocol for transmission of video data between transmitters and receivers on a network. The protocol specifies a color format that allows for high video quality and minimizes the complexity of the receiver. Transmitters convert video data into the designated protocol as needed. The designated protocol specifies a color format including a luminance value and two chrominance values. Quantized differential coding is applied to the luminance value and subsampling is performed on the chrominance values to reduce transmission bandwidth requirements. Upscaling of video data is performed at the receiver, whereas downscaling is performed at the transmitter. Various display sizes can thus be accommodated with efficient use of network bandwidth.

[origin: WO9955013A2] A method and apparatus of supporting a video protocol in a network environment. In an embodiment of the invention, video processing and hardware requirements associated with a receiver are minimized by specifying a single video protocol for transmission of video data between transmitters and receivers on a network. The protocol specifies a color format that allows for high video quality and minimizes the complexity of the receiver. Transmitters are equipped with transformation mechanisms that provide for conversion of video data into the designated protocol as needed. Compression of the components of the color format is provided to reduce transmission bandwidth requirements. In one embodiment, aspects of the designated protocol compensate for problems associated with transmitting video data over a network. The designated protocol specifies a color format including a luminance value and two chrominance values. Quantized differential coding is applied to the luminance value and subsampling is performed on the chrominance values to reduce transmission bandwidth requirements. Upscaling of video data is performed at the receiver, whereas downscaling is performed at the transmitter. Various display sizes can thus be accommodated with efficient use of network bandwidth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/30 (2006.01); H04N 7/34 (2006.01); H04N 7/46 (2006.01); H04N 9/64 (2006.01); H04N 11/04 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 9/67 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 11/042 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04N 9/641 (2013.01); H04N 19/126 (2014.11); H04N 19/186 (2014.11); H04N 19/40 (2014.11); H04N 19/59 (2014.11); H04N 19/593 (2014.11); H04N 21/234354 (2013.01); H04N 21/4143 (2013.01); H04N 21/440254 (2013.01); H04L 69/08 (2013.01); H04N 5/4401 (2013.01); H04N 9/67 (2013.01); H04N 11/044 (2013.01); H04N 19/124 (2014.11); H04N 19/60 (2014.11); H04N 21/4788 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955013A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955013 A2 19991028; WO 9955013 A3 20000427; AU 3656799 A 19991108; AU 760841 B2 20030522; CA 2329426 A1 19991028; EP 1074091 A2 20010207; JP 2002512470 A 20020423

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1035972

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-10-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20040516

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE