Global Patent Index - EP 1074103 A1

EP 1074103 A1 2001-02-07 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING A PLURALITY OF SIGNALS HAVING DIFFERENT FREQUENCY BANDWIDTHS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING A PLURALITY OF SIGNALS HAVING DIFFERENT FREQUENCY BANDWIDTHS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR DEN EMPFANG VON MEHREREN SIGNALEN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN BAND BREITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RECEVOIR UNE PLURALITE DE SIGNAUX POSSEDANT DES LARGEURS DE BANDE DE FREQUENCES DIFFERENTES

Publication

EP 1074103 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914020 A

Priority

  • US 9906170 W
  • US 6531398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955026A1] A first mixer (306) shifts a first end (208) of a desired signal frequency bandwidth (206) of a desired signal (202) to an edge (508) of a first filter frequency bandwidth (502) of a first filter (312), wherein the first filter frequency bandwidth (502) is greater than the desired signal frequency bandwidth (206). Signals within a first undesired frequency spectrum (504) are attenuated by the first filter (314). A second mixer (316) shifts a second end (210) of the desired signal frequency bandwidth (206) to an edge (608) of a second filter frequency bandwidth (602) of a second filter (320) to receive the desired signal (202).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/10 (2006.01); H04B 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/28 (2013.01); H04B 1/1036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955026 A1 19991028; AU 3196399 A 19991108; AU 740454 B2 20011101; EP 1074103 A1 20010207; EP 1074103 A4 20040512; US 6088569 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051229

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-05-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACH, CHRISTOPHER, R.

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SMITH, PATRICK, D.

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB