Global Patent Index - EP 1074187 A8

EP 1074187 A8 2001-05-02 - Simultaneous slicing and washing of vegetables

Title (en)

Simultaneous slicing and washing of vegetables

Title (de)

Gleichzeitiges Schneiden und Waschen von Gemüse

Title (fr)

Découpage et lavage simultanés des légumes

Publication

EP 1074187 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00306322 A

Priority

US 36665999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1074187A2] Simultaneous slicing and washing of relatively firm raw vegetable or fruit products is accomplished in a vat of water into which a slicer apparatus is positioned such that the slices are formed and discharge directly into the water and free fall. An inclined takeout conveyor serves to receive the slices and remove them from the water. A circulating water current and fluid jets urge the slices to disperse onto the conveyor. A spray of water removes residual vegetable matter from the slice surfaces before leaving the takeout conveyor for further processing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23N 15/00; A23N 12/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01); A23L 19/00 (2016.01); A23L 19/12 (2016.01); A23N 12/02 (2006.01); A23N 15/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/10 (2006.01); B26D 1/36 (2006.01); B26D 3/26 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 7/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/0691 (2013.01); A23N 12/02 (2013.01); A23N 12/023 (2013.01); A23N 15/00 (2013.01); B26D 1/03 (2013.01); B26D 7/0658 (2013.01); B26D 7/27 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074187 A2 20010207; EP 1074187 A3 20010822; EP 1074187 A8 20010502; EP 1074187 B1 20040121; AU 4885800 A 20010308; AU 779208 B2 20050113; CA 2314616 A1 20010203; CA 2314616 C 20090414; DE 60007809 D1 20040226; DE 60007809 T2 20041202; JP 2001086970 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130725

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60007809

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130725

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-02-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-05-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007809 P 20040226

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB NL SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 23N 15/00 A, 7A 23N 12/02 B, 7B 26D 1/36 B, 7B 26D 7/06 B

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CARIDIS, ANDREW A.

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SILVESTER, JOHN

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROWN, DANIEL E.

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MURGEL, LEONARDO P.

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEITSAYADEH, CARL

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI