Global Patent Index - EP 1074191 A2

EP 1074191 A2 2001-02-07 - Anatomically curved belt

Title (en)

Anatomically curved belt

Title (de)

Anatomisch gebogener Gürtel

Title (fr)

Ceinture courbée de manière anatomique

Publication

EP 1074191 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830533 A

Priority

IT FI990100 U

Abstract (en)

A belt comprising a band (1) made of leather or of another material having substantially the same stiffness, and a buckle (2) for mutually engaging the ends of said band (1), is characterised in that the band (1), when open and stretched over a plane, has a curved shaped, i.e. outlined by two generally curved longitudinal edges (1a, 1b). When the belt is worn, it takes up a substantially frustoconical shape, the shorter longitudinal edge (1b) being placed on the upper side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41F 9/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074191 A2 20010207; EP 1074191 A3 20011010; IT 248303 Y1 20030128; IT FI990100 U1 20010130; IT FI990100 V0 19990730

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI